THE BRECONSHIRE FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS

Charity number: 523668
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £82.61k £81.20k £103.56k £130.52k £124.33k
Total expenditure £79.32k £81.83k £73.80k £94.82k £86.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £58.00k £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £33.71k