FOURCROSSES VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of the Ganolfan Y Ffor.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2018
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 28 February 1967: Standard registration
- CANOLFAN GYMDEITHASOL Y FFOR (Working name)
- FOURCROSSES MEMORIAL HALL (Working name)
- FOURCROSSES MEMORIAL HALL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GLYN ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
YVONNE MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GWYN BERE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAFYDD LLOYD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN LOWTHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IRENE JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.13k | £5.23k | £5.78k | £4.86k | £2.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.83k | £2.44k | £4.30k | £1.89k | £5.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 821 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 821 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1186 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1186 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1551 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1551 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 21ST NOVEMBER, 1947
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL, MORAL AND INTELECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS, LIBRARY, LECTURES, CLASSES RECREATIONS AND ENTERTAINMENTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
THE VILLAGE OF FOUR CROSSES AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
TERANEDD
CAERNARFON ROAD
CRICCIETH
LL52 0AU
- Phone:
- 01766522331
- Email:
- daviestrysor@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window