ROCKINGHAM MINERS' WELFARE RECREATION GROUND
Charity Number: 523732
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2005
Total income: £4,005
Total expenditure: £4,005
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
- Barnsley
Governance
Registration history:
- 03 December 1964: Standard registration
- 17 August 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 24 March 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
UNDERLEASE DATED 21 JUNE 1956.
Charitable objects
A RECREATION GROUND
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
HOYLAND COMMON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window