THE ADEL COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 523748
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide a meeting place where members of the local community may carry on social activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £10,671
Total expenditure: £16,936

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Leeds City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 November 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • ADEL & IRELAND WOOD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR MEL SILVER Chair
SLACK AND TIGHT AMATEUR REPERTORY SOCIETY
Received: On time
Jeffrey Brown Trustee 09 August 2021
None on record
Stephen Christopher Limb Trustee 17 August 2015
LEEDS COMMUNITY ARTS NETWORK
Received: On time
DAVID NICHOLAS WAITE Trustee 15 September 2011
SLACK AND TIGHT AMATEUR REPERTORY SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL TEAM PARISH OF MOOR ALLERTON AND SHADWELL
Received: On time
FRANCES MARY SILVER Trustee
None on record
JOY CHRISTINE BINNS Trustee
None on record
BRIAN CHARLES STEAD Trustee
None on record
CHRISTOPHER DAVID BINNS Trustee
SLACK AND TIGHT AMATEUR REPERTORY SOCIETY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £14.02k £21.13k £16.98k £13.91k £10.67k
Total expenditure £11.16k £8.16k £9.45k £9.61k £16.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.34k £4.76k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 17 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 05 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 16 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Adel & Ireland Wood Community Centr
New Adel Lane
LEEDS
LS16 6AZ
Phone:
07772595880
Website:

No information available