SHEFFIELD FEDERATION FOR SCHOOL SPORTS

Charity number: 523931
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 24 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 30 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 30 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 30 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 30 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 31 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 01 June 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)