THURNSCOE (COMMON ROAD) MINERS' WELFARE SCHEME

Charity Number: 523972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Recreation ground

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £3,228
Total expenditure: £3,228

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnsley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 August 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THURNSOE (COMMON ROAD) MINERS' WELFARE SCHEME (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Barnsley Metropolitan Borough Council Trustee
MINERS' RECREATION GROUND, (ARDSLEY)
Received: On time
SILKSTONE COMMON RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
MONK BRETTON RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
KING GEORGE'S FIELD, HOYLAND NETHER
Received: On time
BIRDWELL RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
SHAFTON PLAYGROUND CHARITY
Received: On time
PUBLIC PARK AND RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
WOMBWELL MAIN MINERS' WELFARE SCHEME
Received: On time
MINERS' RECREATION GROUND - BARUGH GREEN
Received: On time
HIGHAM MINER'S INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
RECREATION GROUND KEXBOROUGH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.88k £2.83k £3.08k £2.84k £3.23k
Total expenditure £4.88k £2.83k £3.08k £2.84k £3.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Barnsley MBC - Legal Services
PO Box 634
Barnsley
S70 9GG
Phone:
07900 761 052
Website:

No information available