WALTON COMMUNITY CENTRE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 523989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required