WALTON COMMUNITY CENTRE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 523989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £24.81k £29.11k £35.34k £25.83k £36.24k
Total expenditure £22.85k £19.69k £16.64k £17.06k £13.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £8.90k N/A £24.05k