Financial history MINERS WELFARE RECREATION OR PLEASURE GROUND

Charity number: 523993
Charity reporting is overdue by 846 days

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0