Accounts and annual returns LLANARMON DYFFRYN CEIRIOG VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 524054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 22 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 20 May 2021 294 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 20 May 2021 660 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 23 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 04 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required