HEOL-Y-CYW WELFARE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 524146
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.94k £8.68k £5.60k £11.31k £8.33k
Total expenditure £6.69k £7.95k £10.53k £7.71k £11.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A