Accounts and annual returns CRAIG CEFN PARC WELFARE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 524190
Charity reporting is overdue by 115 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 115 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 115 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 06 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 06 February 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 08 June 2022 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 08 June 2022 100 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 23 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 23 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 28 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required