Financial history PENCOED WELFARE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 524211
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £25.01k £33.08k £38.18k £41.82k £30.04k
Total expenditure £23.74k £29.14k £37.84k £31.71k £36.82k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £23.18k £3.50k