Accounts and annual returns TOWNHILL COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 524250
Charity reporting is overdue by 1636 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 175 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 175 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 540 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 540 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 905 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 905 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1270 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1270 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1636 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1636 days