Financial history TOWNHILL COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 524250
Charity reporting is overdue by 1625 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £14.17k £14.13k £35.14k £20.36k £12.98k
Total expenditure £18.24k £18.84k £15.44k £12.22k £19.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A