SWFFRYD COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational and Recreational Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £700 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Blaenau Gwent
Governance
- 19 September 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Johnson | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|||||
LESLEY COLTHERD | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANET JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GWENDOLINE PROTHEROE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DENNIS HUGHES MBE MMS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.74k | £23.02k | £16.59k | £24.90k | £23.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.33k | £23.02k | £20.38k | £24.61k | £21.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.00k | £3.79k | N/A | £700 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31ST JANUARY 1963
Charitable objects
A CUMMUNITY CENTRE FOR MEMBERS OF THE MINING COMMUNITY (B) TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES TO FURTHER THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
URBAN DISTRICT OF ABERTILLERY
Contact information
- Address:
-
CARTREF
RECTORY VILLAS
CRUMLIN
NEWPORT
NP11 5DU
- Phone:
- 01495248290
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window