MANMOEL COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 524358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £2.36k £4.83k £7.53k £1.97k £3.25k
Total expenditure £1.34k £3.54k £3.06k £5.55k £3.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A