Trustees LLANFECHAIN MEMORIAL HALL
Charity Number: 524415

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIta DUFF | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Philip Ellison | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Warburton | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ronald North | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Dunwell | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Nursall | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennie Castle | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
John James Reilly | Trustee | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
June Row | Trustee | 14 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Richards | Trustee | 14 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alfred Wynn Griffiths | Trustee | 21 April 2010 |
|
|
||||
GWYNNE OWEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT JONES-PERROTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID SHILLITO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUTH NORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.