SOLVA MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village hall used for fund raising, meetings & community activites
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 24 February 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Rees | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Barker | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Metson Carter | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Thomas | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Bowie-Moore | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ffion Matthews | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rona Sheila McGregor | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Southwell | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN CROWTHER HIGGINS | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Joe Griffin | Trustee | 01 April 2008 |
|
|||||
MOLLIE ROACH | Trustee | 09 July 2001 |
|
|||||
Jane Madeline Pascoe | Trustee | 09 July 2001 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES BARKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL-ANN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.95k | £23.76k | £5.27k | £11.33k | £9.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.67k | £4.72k | £10.22k | £15.32k | £21.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 May 2024 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 9 JULY 2001
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
VILLAGE OF SOLVA AND THE PARISH OF WHITCHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Cart House
Caermedris Farm
Solva
Haverfordwest
SA62 6XL
- Phone:
- 01437720213
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window