Financial history VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 524463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £7.82k £9.40k £9.26k £17.67k £12.71k
Total expenditure £7.73k £6.42k £7.84k £3.53k £5.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £13.50k £10.70k