Trustees 12TH CITY (TUNSTALL) STOKE-ON-TRENT AND NEWCASTLE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524534
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Bath Chair 13 November 2013
None on record
Clair Fleet Trustee 08 May 2017
None on record
Catherine Forbes Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
Natilie Sandra Hill Trustee 06 June 2016
None on record
David Fairbrother Trustee 20 November 2013
None on record
STUART EDGERTON Trustee 13 November 2013
None on record
Julie Jones Trustee 13 November 2013
None on record
Anthony John Porter Trustee 13 November 2013
None on record