58TH STOKE-ON-TRENT AND NEWCASTLE (CAVERSWALL) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of Caverswall Scout Group is to provide fun, adventure and friendship through an exciting program of activities. We cater for a range of young people from able-bodied boys and girls to those who are disabled, disadvantaged or may have behavioural problems. It is our aim to cater for all young people in the community. We do not discriminate no matter what their background.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 23 May 1967: Standard registration
- 58TH STOKE-ON-TRENT BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DIANE EDWARDS | Chair | 24 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Rhodes | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Mifflin | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ian Ryles | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.87k | £14.93k | £20.46k | £11.88k | £13.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.91k | £7.86k | £13.56k | £23.22k | £14.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.77k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4TH JANUARY 1912.
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
STOKE-ON-TRENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Willowcroft Rise
Blythe Bridge
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST11 9ST
- Phone:
- 01782398687
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window