Trustees 1ST HALESOWEN SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524625
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian Mark Timmins Chair 14 May 2019
None on record
Dr Paul Taylor Trustee 28 July 2020
None on record
Gail White Trustee 14 May 2019
None on record
Margaret Anne McCann Trustee 14 May 2019
None on record
Caroline Elizabeth Betteridge Trustee 14 May 2019
None on record
Claire Timmins Trustee 18 May 2017
None on record
Danielle Baptiste Trustee 18 May 2017
None on record
Peter Case Trustee 18 May 2017
None on record
John Sankey Trustee 19 May 2014
None on record
ALISON ELIZABETH WOOD Trustee 18 August 2013
None on record
BERTRAM ANTHONY ALCOCK Trustee
LUTLEY DAY CENTRE SENIOR CITIZENS AND DISABLED GROUP
Overdue by 1202 days
SARAH LINDSEY REYNOLDS Trustee
None on record
IAN MARTIN DALE Trustee
None on record
CLIFFORD EDWARD SHACKLETON Trustee
None on record
ROGER WHITE Trustee
None on record
SANDRA SMITH Trustee
None on record
JOHN CHARLES CARTER Trustee
None on record