Accounts and annual returns 16TH WYRE FOREST (STOURPORT ST MICHAELS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524640
Charity reporting is overdue by 165 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 165 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 165 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 08 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 25 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 11 December 2020 310 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required