Financial history 16TH WYRE FOREST (STOURPORT ST MICHAELS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £10.50k £8.57k £8.13k £20.55k £15.24k
Total expenditure £7.67k £9.13k £7.98k £6.02k £12.34k
Income from government contracts £2.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £19.43k £10.67k