21ST WEST HULL (ST MARTIN'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524664
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.75k £2.37k £3.63k £5.18k £46
Total expenditure £2.25k £1.76k £3.14k £3.12k £1.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A