Accounts and annual returns FIRST SLEIGHTS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524677
Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 113 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 113 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 February 2018 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required