Financial history FIRST SLEIGHTS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524677
Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.84k £12.11k £15.98k £20.69k £18.86k
Total expenditure £11.08k £12.35k £12.38k £16.96k £14.33k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A £1.00k