1ST CAERNARVON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 April 2021 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 July 2019 163 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required