WREXHAM DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 524875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 22 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 29 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 08 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 08 September 2016 On time Download