WREXHAM DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 524875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £61.02k £112.86k £104.84k £173.14k £68.08k
Total expenditure £60.52k £109.35k £74.98k £148.05k £63.55k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.14k £0 N/A £2.00k