Financial history 7TH CARDIFF GROUP OF SCOUTS

Charity number: 524904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £24.45k £23.91k £21.28k £22.80k £24.65k
Total expenditure £8.76k £18.40k £26.22k £19.23k £19.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £14.00k £10.00k N/A N/A N/A