15TH CARDIFF (ST JOHN'S CANTON) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524906
Charity reporting is overdue by 1787 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013
Total gross income £11.87k £11.64k £16.17k £13.98k £13.25k
Total expenditure £7.43k £7.86k £10.91k £7.20k £7.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A