Accounts and annual returns TORFAEN SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 524993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 15 July 2019 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required