Accounts and annual returns 5TH RISCA SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524995
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 November 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 November 2021 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required