Financial history 5TH RISCA SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524995
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £13.16k £10.02k £14.41k £14.13k £26.34k
Total expenditure £13.16k £8.62k £16.93k £12.54k £17.67k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.65k £275 N/A N/A £14.00k