CANOLFAN CYMDEITHASOL PORTHMADOG (PORTMADOC COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Town and County Council meetings, NSPCC fundraisers, GCC youth strategy, Career support, CPD Porthmadog FC support, Bingo, Church services, Ffestiniog railway meetings, Merched y gest, English and Welsh learning classes, Weight watchers, Porthmadog Fire service, Young farmers club, Wrestling, Concerts, Club for the Blind, Local produce market, Line dancing, art classes and Family history events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 04 December 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wena Thomas | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Williams | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Arwel Lewis Jones | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
IWAN AP TREFOR | Trustee | 03 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.74k | £68.02k | £86.94k | £123.75k | £64.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.39k | £53.62k | £88.19k | £104.42k | £60.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £58.58k | £14.00k | £15.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 7TH APRIL 1972 as amended on 05 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PORTMADOC URBAN AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITY, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
PORTMADOC URBAN AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Canolfan Cymdeithasol Porthmadog
Stryd Fawr
Porthmadog
Gwynedd
LL49 9LU
- Phone:
- 01766 513 372
- Email:
- y-ganolfan@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window