Accounts and annual returns BLAKENHALL LEISURE AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 525085
Charity reporting is overdue by 351 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 351 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 351 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 11 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 11 March 2022 224 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 22 September 2020 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 15 January 2020 169 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required