Accounts and annual returns 1ST POYNTON (ST GEORGES) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 525109
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 February 2019 4 days late Download Open in new window