20TH STAFFORD (ST BERTELIN'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 525126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £9.44k £9.13k £8.06k £9.74k £7.80k
Total expenditure £7.50k £7.26k £5.89k £8.48k £7.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A