29TH ORMSKIRK (BURSCOUGH ST JOHN) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 525129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £21.20k £22.68k £25.64k £26.06k £28.38k
Total expenditure £19.78k £21.92k £23.34k £26.39k £24.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A