THE OXCROFT RECREATION GROUND AND WELFARE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 525164
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 07 April 2017 06 July 2018 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 02 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required