THE OXCROFT RECREATION GROUND AND WELFARE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 525164
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 07/04/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £17.76k £13.85k £35.15k £32.66k £22.26k
Total expenditure £19.65k £20.03k £27.36k £37.05k £26.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £10.00k £10.00k £10.60k