Financial history 1ST BURNMOOR SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 525189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £11.57k £19.29k £39.10k £71.54k £168.83k
Total expenditure £18.62k £24.37k £35.48k £29.38k £27.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.00k N/A £30.16k £99.04k