CHURCH HOSTEL

Charity number: 525320
Charity reporting is overdue by 794 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2013 31/07/2014 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017
Total gross income £112.13k £84.45k £103.45k £7.30k £1.84k
Total expenditure £91.08k £96.95k £86.47k £26.26k £99.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A