EVAN MORGAN PRIZES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Awarded to the best pupil academically, at each secondary school in the Ceredigion Area, from the new entrants from the primary schools at the end of the first year. PupilÔÇÖs achievement must include proficiency in the Welsh and English Languages and Elementary Mathematics.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Ceredigion
Governance
- 05 October 1984: Standard registration
- 09 September 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- EVAN MORGAN SCHOLARSHIPS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 23 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 11 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 5 DECEMBER 1983
Charitable objects
AWARDING PRIZES TO PUPILS OF COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL IN THE DISTRICT OF CEREDIGION IN THE COUNTY OF DYFED WHO ARE ABOUT TO ATTEND COUNTY SECONDARY SCHOOLS IN THAT DISTRICT IN RECOGNITION OF THEIR ACADEMIC ACHIEVEMENTS WHICH MUST INCLUDE PROFICIENCY IN THE WELSH AND ENGLISH LANGUAGES AND ELEMENTARY MATHEMATICS.
Area of benefit
FORMER COUNTY OF CARDIGAN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window