Financial history FHS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 525489
Charity reporting is overdue by 19 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £1.22m £1.53m £1.60m £1.65m £1.86m
Total expenditure £1.39m £1.54m £1.64m £1.68m £1.90m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £66.83k N/A £129.19k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £66.47k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.19m £1.50m £1.57m £1.63m £1.84m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £27.00k £27.00k £27.00k £27.00k £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.39m £1.54m £1.64m £1.68m £1.90m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £8.40k £9.68k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0