Accounts and annual returns THE LADY FLORENCE NICHOLAS PRIZE FUND IN CONNECTION WITH PORTH COUNTY GRAMMAR SCHOOL

Charity number: 525573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required