THE MONMOUTHSHIRE FARM SCHOOL ENDOWMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing Grants to individuals for land based couses who live in the area of receipt
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Blaenau Gwent
- Caerphilly
- Monmouthshire
- Torfaen
Governance
- 01 December 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martyn Groucutt | Chair | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Penri James | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maria Stevens | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Cross | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Andrews | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane McKenna | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Wright | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Morgan | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Clark | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Murphy | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Jones | Trustee | 03 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.51k | £26.51k | £28.16k | £27.36k | £30.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.06k | £16.40k | £10.84k | £5.84k | £9.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 14 NOVEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 23 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN AGRICULTURE AND RELATED SUBJECTS AT THE COLLEGE OR OTHER COLLEGE; AND (B) THE RELIEF OF BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. THE TRUSTEES MUST GIVE PREFERENCE TO PERSONS UNDER 25. WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE WHO ARE, OR ARE ABOUT TO BECOME STUDENTS AT THE FARM SCHOOL OR INSTITUTE AT USK.
Area of benefit
MONMOUTHSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Monmouthshire County Council
Election Office
The Rhadyr
USK
NP15 1GA
- Phone:
- 01633 644549
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window