THE JOHN BEDDOES TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants to individuals and organisations in East Radnorshire for educational purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Powys
Governance
- 01 February 1967: Standard registration
- POWYS RADNORSHIRE EDUCATIONAL ENDOWMENT (Previous name)
- THE RADNORSHIRE INTERMEDIATE AND TECHNICAL EDUCATION FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beverley Baynham | Chair | 15 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Paul Richard Marsh | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Louise Powell | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sonja Parg | Trustee | 15 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.61k | £7.50k | £7.24k | £6.51k | £7.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.08k | £5.39k | £2.24k | £4.42k | £6.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 4 DECEMBER 1995 REPLACED BY FULLY REGULATING SCHEME OF 25 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
PROVIDING FOR THE JOHN BEDDOES SCHOOL SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT FORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BETWEEN THE GOVERNORS OF THE SAID SCHOOL AND THE TRUSTEES AFTER CONSULTATION WITH THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY; FOR FURTHER OBJECTS, PLEASE SEE SCHEME.
Area of benefit
FORMER ADMINISTRATIVE COUNTY OF EAST RADNOR
Contact information
- Address:
-
JOHN BEDDOES CAMPUS
BROADAXE LANE
PRESTEIGNE
POWYS
LD8 2YT
- Phone:
- 01544267259
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window